Type a math problem

AC

log

ln

(

)

7

8

9

τ

π

4

5

6

≤

≥

%

θ

1

2

3

<

>

x

i

0

.

y

This site uses cookies for analytics, personalized content and ads. By continuing to browse this site, you agree to this use. Learn more

Type a math problem

AC

log

ln

(

)

7

8

9

τ

π

4

5

6

≤

≥

%

θ

1

2

3

<

>

x

i

0

.

y

Evaluate

372567

$372567$

Steps For Long Multiplication

699 * 533

$699∗533$

First line up the numbers vertically and match the places from the right like this.

First line up the numbers vertically and match the places from the right like this.

\begin{array}{c}\phantom{\times999}699\\\underline{\times\phantom{999}533}\\\end{array}

$×999699×999533 $

Now multiply the first number with the 1^{st} digit in 2^{nd} number to get intermediate results. That is Multiply 699 with 3. Write the result 2097 at the end leaving 0 spaces to the right like this.

Now multiply the first number with the $1_{st}$ digit in $2_{nd}$ number to get intermediate results. That is Multiply 699 with 3. Write the result 2097 at the end leaving 0 spaces to the right like this.

\begin{array}{c}\phantom{\times999}699\\\underline{\times\phantom{999}533}\\\phantom{\times99}2097\\\end{array}

$×999699×999533 ×992097 $

Now multiply the first number with the 2^{nd} digit in 2^{nd} number to get intermediate results. That is Multiply 699 with 3. Write the result 2097 at the end leaving 1 spaces to the right like this.

Now multiply the first number with the $2_{nd}$ digit in $2_{nd}$ number to get intermediate results. That is Multiply 699 with 3. Write the result 2097 at the end leaving 1 spaces to the right like this.

\begin{array}{c}\phantom{\times999}699\\\underline{\times\phantom{999}533}\\\phantom{\times99}2097\\\phantom{\times9}2097\phantom{9}\\\end{array}

$×999699×999533 ×992097×920979 $

Now multiply the first number with the 3^{rd} digit in 2^{nd} number to get intermediate results. That is Multiply 699 with 5. Write the result 3495 at the end leaving 2 spaces to the right like this.

Now multiply the first number with the $3_{rd}$ digit in $2_{nd}$ number to get intermediate results. That is Multiply 699 with 5. Write the result 3495 at the end leaving 2 spaces to the right like this.

\begin{array}{c}\phantom{\times999}699\\\underline{\times\phantom{999}533}\\\phantom{\times99}2097\\\phantom{\times9}2097\phantom{9}\\\underline{\phantom{\times}3495\phantom{99}}\\\end{array}

$×999699×999533 ×992097×920979×349599 $

Now add the intermediate results to get final answer.

Now add the intermediate results to get final answer.

\begin{array}{c}\phantom{\times999}699\\\underline{\times\phantom{999}533}\\\phantom{\times99}2097\\\phantom{\times9}2097\phantom{9}\\\underline{\phantom{\times}3495\phantom{99}}\\\phantom{\times}372567\end{array}

$×999699×999533 ×992097×920979×349599 ×372567 $

View solution steps

Share

Copy

Copied to clipboard

\begin{array}{c}\phantom{\times999}699\\\underline{\times\phantom{999}533}\\\end{array}

First line up the numbers vertically and match the places from the right like this.

\begin{array}{c}\phantom{\times999}699\\\underline{\times\phantom{999}533}\\\phantom{\times99}2097\\\end{array}

Now multiply the first number with the 1^{st} digit in 2^{nd} number to get intermediate results. That is Multiply 699 with 3. Write the result 2097 at the end leaving 0 spaces to the right like this.

\begin{array}{c}\phantom{\times999}699\\\underline{\times\phantom{999}533}\\\phantom{\times99}2097\\\phantom{\times9}2097\phantom{9}\\\end{array}

Now multiply the first number with the 2^{nd} digit in 2^{nd} number to get intermediate results. That is Multiply 699 with 3. Write the result 2097 at the end leaving 1 spaces to the right like this.

\begin{array}{c}\phantom{\times999}699\\\underline{\times\phantom{999}533}\\\phantom{\times99}2097\\\phantom{\times9}2097\phantom{9}\\\underline{\phantom{\times}3495\phantom{99}}\\\end{array}

Now multiply the first number with the 3^{rd} digit in 2^{nd} number to get intermediate results. That is Multiply 699 with 5. Write the result 3495 at the end leaving 2 spaces to the right like this.

\begin{array}{c}\phantom{\times999}699\\\underline{\times\phantom{999}533}\\\phantom{\times99}2097\\\phantom{\times9}2097\phantom{9}\\\underline{\phantom{\times}3495\phantom{99}}\\\phantom{\times}372567\end{array}

Now add the intermediate results to get final answer.

Examples

Quadratic equation

{ x } ^ { 2 } - 4 x - 5 = 0

$x_{2}−4x−5=0$

Trigonometry

4 \sin \theta \cos \theta = 2 \sin \theta

$4sinθcosθ=2sinθ$

Linear equation

y = 3x + 4

$y=3x+4$

Arithmetic

699 * 533

$699∗533$

Matrix

\left[ \begin{array} { l l } { 2 } & { 3 } \\ { 5 } & { 4 } \end{array} \right] \left[ \begin{array} { l l l } { 2 } & { 0 } & { 3 } \\ { - 1 } & { 1 } & { 5 } \end{array} \right]

$[25 34 ][2−1 01 35 ]$

Simultaneous equation

\left. \begin{cases} { 8x+2y = 46 } \\ { 7x+3y = 47 } \end{cases} \right.

${8x+2y=467x+3y=47 $

Differentiation

\frac { d } { d x } \frac { ( 3 x ^ { 2 } - 2 ) } { ( x - 5 ) }

$dxd (x−5)(3x_{2}−2) $

Integration

\int _ { 0 } ^ { 1 } x e ^ { - x ^ { 2 } } d x

$∫_{0}xe_{−x_{2}}dx$

Limits

\lim _{x \rightarrow-3} \frac{x^{2}-9}{x^{2}+2 x-3}

$x→−3lim x_{2}+2x−3x_{2}−9 $

Back to top